IA SSB1241 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Transportation.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Transportation.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to vehicle recyclers, including the transfer of motor vehicles to vehicle recyclers and compliance with the national motor vehicle title information system, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to vehicle recyclers, including the transfer of motor vehicles to vehicle recyclers and compliance with the national motor vehicle title information system, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted - Transportation. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 11:00AM; Law Library Transportation. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Transportation: Bowman Chair,Brase, and Kapucian. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | In Transportation |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF482 (Replaced by) 2015-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 656.
HF563 (Replaced by) 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 875.
SF422 (Replaced by) 2015-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 780.
HF563 (Replaced by) 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 875.
SF422 (Replaced by) 2015-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 780.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1241 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1241.html |