IA SSB1235 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF434
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to continuing education requirements for licensed barbers.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to continuing education requirements for licensed barbers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 10:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge State Government. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | State Government: Horn Chair,Bertrand, and Schoenjahn. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | In State Government |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF434 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.