IA SSB1229 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF528

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to reports prepared by a chief medical officer, licensed physician, or a mental health professional concerning the hospitalization of a person with a mental illness.(See SF 528.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to reports prepared by a chief medical officer, licensed physician, or a mental health professional concerning the hospitalization of a person with a mental illness.(See SF 528.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528.
2021-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-02-25SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 3:30PM RM 111.
2021-02-25SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Mathis.
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-02-25SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

SF528 (Replaced by) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 726.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback