IA SSB1227 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF373
Note: Legislation replaced by HF536

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A study bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A study bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateVoted - Judiciary.
2015-02-26Senate11:00AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary.
2015-02-25SenateJudiciary: Shipley Chair,Bisignano, and Taylor.
2015-02-25SenateIn Judiciary
2015-02-25SenateDate Recorded

Same As/Similar To

HSB193 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
SF373 (Replaced by) 2015-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 675.
HF536 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback