IA SSB1225 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF395
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the definition of stalking and making penalties applicable.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the definition of stalking and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 11:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Judiciary: Petersen Chair,Garrett, and Taylor. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF395 (Replaced by) 2015-03-24 - Subcommittee, Rogers, Heartsill, and Meyer. H.J. 692.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1225 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1225.html |