IA SSB1218 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF569

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to local government property taxes, financial authority, operations, and budgets, modifying certain transit funding, property tax credits and exemptions, and appropriations, requiring certain information related to property taxation to be provided to property owners and taxpayers, modifying provisions relating to fees for driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards, modifying provisions relating to certain writing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, retroactive applicability, and applicability provisions.(See SF 569.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to local government property taxes, financial authority, operations, and budgets, modifying certain transit funding, property tax credits and exemptions, and appropriations, requiring certain information related to property taxation to be provided to property owners and taxpayers, modifying provisions relating to fees for driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards, modifying provisions relating to certain writing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, retroactive applicability, and applicability provisions.(See SF 569.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 569.
2023-04-18SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-04-17SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 04/18/2023 8:15AM Senate Lounge.
2023-04-17SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker.
2023-04-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means.
2023-04-17SenateBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

SF569 (Replaced by) 2023-04-26 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback