IA SSB1217 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF555
Note: Legislation replaced by HF699
Note: Legislation replaced by HF699
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to weight limitations for certain implements of husbandry.
Title
A bill for an act relating to weight limitations for certain implements of husbandry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kapucian, and Kinney. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB218 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 418.
SF555 (Replaced by) 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
HF699 (Replaced by) 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
SF555 (Replaced by) 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
HF699 (Replaced by) 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1217 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1217.html |