IA SSB1212 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF520
Note: Legislation replaced by HF739
Note: Legislation replaced by HF739
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 520.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 520.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 9:30AM RM 111. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bolkcom, and Taylor, J. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB236 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 739.
SF520 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 830.
HF739 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF520 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 830.
HF739 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1212 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1212.html |