IA SSB1206 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF605
Note: Legislation replaced by SF559
Note: Legislation replaced by SF559
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance notices and documents delivered by electronic means to a consumer that purchases portable electronics insurance in a retail transaction.
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance notices and documents delivered by electronic means to a consumer that purchases portable electronics insurance in a retail transaction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Koelker, and Bolkcom. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB182 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 381.
HF605 (Replaced by) 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
SF559 (Replaced by) 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
HF605 (Replaced by) 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
SF559 (Replaced by) 2019-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 891.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1206 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1206.html |