IA SSB1203 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SCR5
Note: Legislation replaced by HCR9

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SCR 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging the members of Congress to amend federal law to increase the maximum gross weight allowed for motor vehicles operated on the interstate road system in Iowa and bordering states.(See SCR 5.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging the members of Congress to amend federal law to increase the maximum gross weight allowed for motor vehicles operated on the interstate road system in Iowa and bordering states.(See SCR 5.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SCR 5.
2023-02-28SenateSubcommittee: Klimesh, Bennett, Bisignano, Bousselot, Brown, Celsi, Cournoyer, De Witt, Dickey, Giddens, Koelker, Lofgren, Rozenboom, Shipley, Taylor, T., Webster, Winckler, and Zumbach.
2023-02-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation.
2023-02-28SenateBy COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

HSB212 (Related) 2023-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HCR 9.
SCR5 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 892.
HCR9 (Replaced by) 2023-04-20 - Message from Senate. H.J. 891.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback