IA SSB1195 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF476

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to county or city legislation affecting dog ownership.(See SF 476.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to county or city legislation affecting dog ownership.(See SF 476.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 476.
2023-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-27SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 4:30PM Room 315.
2023-02-27SenateSubcommittee: Cournoyer, Bisignano, and Kraayenbrink.
2023-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government.
2023-02-27SenateBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

SF476 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1092.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback