IA SSB1194 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF524
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations in a civil action involving certain sexual offenses against a minor.(See SF 524.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations in a civil action involving certain sexual offenses against a minor.(See SF 524.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 3:00PM Room 315. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Boulton, and Zaun. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF524 (Replaced by) 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 97.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1194 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1194.html |