IA SSB1194 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for procedures to verify eligibility for unemployment benefits and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for procedures to verify eligibility for unemployment benefits and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2021 12:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Jochum, and Whiting. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR AND BUSINESS RELATIONS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1194 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1194.html |