IA SSB1177 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF499
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2280
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2280
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to law enforcement profiling by standardizing collection and centralizing the compilation and reporting of officer stop and compliant data, providing for officer training, creating a community policing advisory board, providing for penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to law enforcement profiling by standardizing collection and centralizing the compilation and reporting of officer stop and compliant data, providing for officer training, creating a community policing advisory board, providing for penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Schneider, Taylor, and Zaun. S.J. 216. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 10:00AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2017 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Zaun, and Petersen. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF499 (Replaced by) 2017-03-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 500.
SF2280 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 692.
SF2280 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 692.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1177 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1177.html |