IA SSB1171 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF593
Note: Legislation replaced by SF497
Note: Legislation replaced by SF497
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the issuance and suspension of motor vehicle registrations and certificates of title.(See SF 497.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the issuance and suspension of motor vehicle registrations and certificates of title.(See SF 497.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 497. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Bennett, and Lofgren. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB186 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 593.
HF593 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
SF497 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 814.
HF593 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
SF497 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 814.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1171 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1171.html |