IA SSB1171 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF456
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act concerning the sale and off=premises transportation and consumption of certain containers of beer.
Title
A study bill for an act concerning the sale and off=premises transportation and consumption of certain containers of beer.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 8:30AM; Room 206 State Government. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | State Government: Danielson Chair,Horn, and Johnson. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | In State Government |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF456 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.