IA SSB1170 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF414
Note: Legislation replaced by HF631
Note: Legislation replaced by HF631
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act providing for the creation of first=time homebuyer savings accounts in Iowa, including related individual income tax exemptions, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill for an act providing for the creation of first=time homebuyer savings accounts in Iowa, including related individual income tax exemptions, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 11:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge State Government. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | State Government: McCoy Chair,Dearden, and Whitver. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | In State Government |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF414 (Replaced by) 2015-04-01 - Fiscal note. SCS.
HSB234 (Related) 2015-04-07 - Voted - Ways and Means.
HF631 (Replaced by) 2015-05-12 - Subcommittee, Jochum, Bolkcom, and Smith. S.J. 1017.
HSB234 (Related) 2015-04-07 - Voted - Ways and Means.
HF631 (Replaced by) 2015-05-12 - Subcommittee, Jochum, Bolkcom, and Smith. S.J. 1017.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1170 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1170.html |