IA SSB1152 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wind energy conversion facilities and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to wind energy conversion facilities and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 8:30AM RM 111. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Ragan, and Rozenboom. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1152 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1152.html |