IA SSB1147 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF382
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2279
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2279
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the issuance of and violations of civil protective orders and criminal no=contact orders and modifying penalties.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the issuance of and violations of civil protective orders and criminal no=contact orders and modifying penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Judiciary: Petersen Chair,Taylor, and Schneider. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB120 (Related) 2013-02-14 - Judiciary: Heartsill Chair,Wolfe, and Windschitl.
SF382 (Replaced by) 2014-01-16 - Subcommittee, Petersen, Schneider, and Taylor. S.J. 83.
HF2279 (Replaced by) 2014-03-27 - Amendment S-5103 filed. S.J. 666.
SF382 (Replaced by) 2014-01-16 - Subcommittee, Petersen, Schneider, and Taylor. S.J. 83.
HF2279 (Replaced by) 2014-03-27 - Amendment S-5103 filed. S.J. 666.