IA SSB1141 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF319
Note: Legislation replaced by HF460
Note: Legislation replaced by HF460
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning private sector employee drug testing.(See SF 319.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning private sector employee drug testing.(See SF 319.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 11:30AM Room 315. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Donahue, and McClintock. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Workforce. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WORKFORCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF319 (Replaced by) 2024-02-08 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 235.
HSB179 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 460.
HF460 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Labor and Workforce. H.J. 1029.
HSB179 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 460.
HF460 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Labor and Workforce. H.J. 1029.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1141 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1141.html |