IA SSB1134 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HJR11
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Dawson.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Dawson.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the qualifications of electors.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the qualifications of electors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Dawson. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Dawson. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB143 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 11.
HJR11 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 711.
HJR11 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 711.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1134 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1134.html |