IA SSB1134 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prescription drugs, including the drug prescribing and dispensing information program, medication-assisted treatment insurance and Medicaid coverage, partial dispensing for opioid medication, and allocation of moneys to the pharmaceutical collection and disposal program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to prescription drugs, including the drug prescribing and dispensing information program, medication-assisted treatment insurance and Medicaid coverage, partial dispensing for opioid medication, and allocation of moneys to the pharmaceutical collection and disposal program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2017 8:00AM Room 206 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Shipley, and Mathis. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB99 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1134 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1134.html |