IA SSB1133 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing mental health professionals to perform certain functions relating to persons with substance-related disorders and persons with mental illness.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing mental health professionals to perform certain functions relating to persons with substance-related disorders and persons with mental illness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2017 5:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, C. Johnson, and Ragan. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF319 (Replaced by) 2017-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 754.
SF464 (Replaced by) 2017-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 811.
HF593 (Replaced by) 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 961.
SF464 (Replaced by) 2017-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 811.
HF593 (Replaced by) 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 961.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1133 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1133.html |