IA SSB1129 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to underground storage tanks, including by creating the Iowa tanks fund and Iowa tanks fund financing program, repealing the Iowa comprehensive petroleum underground storage tank fund, and eliminating the Iowa comprehensive petroleum underground storage tank fund board, requiring a study, and including effective date and transition provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to underground storage tanks, including by creating the Iowa tanks fund and Iowa tanks fund financing program, repealing the Iowa comprehensive petroleum underground storage tank fund, and eliminating the Iowa comprehensive petroleum underground storage tank fund board, requiring a study, and including effective date and transition provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2021 3:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2021 1:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Goodwin, and Lykam. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB135 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 645.
HF645 (Replaced by) 2022-02-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 395.
HF840 (Replaced by) 2022-02-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 395.
HF2337 (Replaced by) 2022-05-20 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps
HF645 (Replaced by) 2022-02-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 395.
HF840 (Replaced by) 2022-02-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 395.
HF2337 (Replaced by) 2022-05-20 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1129 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1129.html |