IA SSB1123 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF368

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Bolkcom, and Green.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the administration of the reimbursement for rent constituting property taxes paid and related matters and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the administration of the reimbursement for rent constituting property taxes paid and related matters and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateSubcommittee: Carlin, Bolkcom, and Green.
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-02-01SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

HSB120 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 368.
HF368 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback