IA SSB1114 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF201
Note: Legislation replaced by SF228

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to tort liability, including employer liability and noneconomic damages in civil actions involving commercial motor vehicles, and punitive or exemplary damages in civil actions generally.(See SF 228.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to tort liability, including employer liability and noneconomic damages in civil actions involving commercial motor vehicles, and punitive or exemplary damages in civil actions generally.(See SF 228.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 228.
2023-02-02SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-01SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Zaun.
2023-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2023-01-31SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB114 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
HF201 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 739.
SF228 (Replaced by) 2023-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback