IA SSB1110 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF391
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Reichman.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Reichman.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances and precursor substances, including amending the controlled substance and precursor substances schedules and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances and precursor substances, including amending the controlled substance and precursor substances schedules and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Reichman. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB74 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 391.
HF391 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
HF391 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1110 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1110.html |