IA SSB1101 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF455
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning jurors, relating to access to certain department of revenue taxpayer information for jury list compilation and juror information confidentiality, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act concerning jurors, relating to access to certain department of revenue taxpayer information for jury list compilation and juror information confidentiality, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Boulton, and Taylor, J. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB77 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
HF455 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 964.
HF455 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 964.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1101 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1101.html |