IA SSB1096 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee: Edler, Green, and Ragan.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the use of generally accepted accounting principles relative to determining allowable costs when reviewing Medicaid provider cost reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the use of generally accepted accounting principles relative to determining allowable costs when reviewing Medicaid provider cost reports.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Green, and Ragan.
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-01-26SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

HSB8 (Related) 2021-01-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 1:30PM House Lounge (Cancelled).

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback