IA SSB1095 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF296
Note: Legislation replaced by HF794
Note: Legislation replaced by HF794
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice.(See SF 296.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice.(See SF 296.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2021 10:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Mathis. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB91 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 794.
SF296 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
HF794 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.
SF296 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
HF794 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1095 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1095.html |