IA SSB1089 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF270
Note: Legislation replaced by SF353
Note: Legislation replaced by SF353
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain deadlines relating to the informal review and protest of property assessments in counties declared to be a disaster area.(See SF 353.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain deadlines relating to the informal review and protest of property assessments in counties declared to be a disaster area.(See SF 353.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 353. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Webster, and Weiner. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB94 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 270.
HF270 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
SF353 (Replaced by) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1023.
HF270 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
SF353 (Replaced by) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1023.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1089 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1089.html |