IA SSB1089 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF524
Note: Legislation replaced by SF404
Note: Legislation replaced by SF404
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the certification and regulation of shorthand reporters.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the certification and regulation of shorthand reporters.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 12:45PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Judiciary: Hogg Chair,Shipley, and Taylor. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB105 (Related) 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF524 (Replaced by) 2015-04-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 829.
SF404 (Replaced by) 2015-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
HF524 (Replaced by) 2015-04-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 829.
SF404 (Replaced by) 2015-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.