IA SSB1082 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF454
Note: Legislation replaced by SF500
Note: Legislation replaced by SF500
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to 911 emergency telephone and internet communication systems and making appropriations.
Title
A bill for an act relating to 911 emergency telephone and internet communication systems and making appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Schultz, and Bowman. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF454 (Replaced by) 2017-03-24 - Fiscal note.
SF500 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
SF500 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1082 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1082.html |