IA SSB1067 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF232
Note: Legislation replaced by SF468

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to probate proceedings, including fiduciary and trustee duties, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 468.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to probate proceedings, including fiduciary and trustee duties, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 468.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 468.
2023-02-23SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 12:00PM Senate Lounge.
2023-01-23SenateSubcommittee: Bousselot, Quirmbach, and Taylor, J.
2023-01-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2023-01-23SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB106 (Related) 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 232.
HF232 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
SF468 (Replaced by) 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Quirmbach, and J. Taylor. S.J. 97.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback