IA SSB1063 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF84
Note: Legislation replaced by HF390

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Green, and Trone Garriott.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to notice requirements prior to discontinuing fluoridation in a public water supply system, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to notice requirements prior to discontinuing fluoridation in a public water supply system, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee: Johnson, Green, and Trone Garriott.
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-01-20SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

HF84 (Replaced by) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
HF390 (Replaced by) 2021-02-23 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Green. S.J. 445.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback