IA SSB1056 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for corporations, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 266, SF 579.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for corporations, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 266, SF 579.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 266. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 1:00PM RM 111. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bolkcom, and Taylor, J. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB39 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 681.
SF266 (Replaced by) 2021-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 601.
HF681 (Replaced by) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
SF579 (Replaced by) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1037.
HF844 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
SF266 (Replaced by) 2021-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 601.
HF681 (Replaced by) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
SF579 (Replaced by) 2021-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1037.
HF844 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1056 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1056.html |