IA SSB1053 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF233
Note: Legislation replaced by SF324

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating a civil remedy for the disclosure of private, sexually explicit images without consent of the depicted individual.(See SF 324.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating a civil remedy for the disclosure of private, sexually explicit images without consent of the depicted individual.(See SF 324.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 324.
2021-01-27SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-25SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 1:00PM RM 111.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee: Johnson, Petersen, and Taylor, J.
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-19SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB31 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 233.
HF233 (Replaced by) 2021-02-10 - Attached to similar SF 324. S.J. 310.
SF324 (Replaced by) 2021-02-15 - Amendment S-3023 filed. S.J. 351.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback