IA SSB1036 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act restricting public agency disclosure of and access to certain personal information related to tax-exempt organizations, and providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act restricting public agency disclosure of and access to certain personal information related to tax-exempt organizations, and providing penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 8:00AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-13SenateSubcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Shipley.
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-13SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback