IA SSB1032 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF491
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 491.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 491.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to grants for new remote workers who relocate to this state and who are employed by an out-of-state employer and creating and making appropriations to the new remote worker grant fund.(See SF 491.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to grants for new remote workers who relocate to this state and who are employed by an out-of-state employer and creating and making appropriations to the new remote worker grant fund.(See SF 491.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 491. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Dotzler, and Green. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR AND BUSINESS RELATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF491 (Replaced by) 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:30AM RM 24A.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1032 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1032.html |