IA SSB1032 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to incentives for whole grade sharing and school district reorganization or dissolution.
Title
A bill for an act relating to incentives for whole grade sharing and school district reorganization or dissolution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Cournoyer, and Danielson. S.J. 127. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF138 (Replaced by) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 602. S.J. 710.
HSB130 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
HF596 (Replaced by) 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF602 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1130.
HSB130 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
HF596 (Replaced by) 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF602 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1130.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1032 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1032.html |