IA SSB1029 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF141
Note: Legislation replaced by HF551
Note: Legislation replaced by HF551
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to and use of the county land record information system.(See SF 141.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to and use of the county land record information system.(See SF 141.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 141. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2023 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Driscoll, and Knox. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF141 (Replaced by) 2023-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HSB164 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 551.
HF551 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1029.
HSB164 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 551.
HF551 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1029.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1029 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1029.html |