IA SSB1025 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF249
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to individuals who fail to fulfill the obligation to engage in practice in a service commitment area under the rural Iowa primary care loan repayment program and including applicability provisions.(See SF 249.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to individuals who fail to fulfill the obligation to engage in practice in a service commitment area under the rural Iowa primary care loan repayment program and including applicability provisions.(See SF 249.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as []. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 11:15AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Gruenhagen, and Quirmbach. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB48 (Related) 2023-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
SF249 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Education. S.J. 1091.
SF249 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Education. S.J. 1091.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1025 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1025.html |