IA SSB1025 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF482
Note: Legislation replaced by SF429
Note: Legislation replaced by SF429
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Kapucian, Kinney and Shipley. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kapucian, Danielson and Shipley. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB37 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
HF482 (Replaced by) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 618.
SF429 (Replaced by) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 625.
HF482 (Replaced by) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 618.
SF429 (Replaced by) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 625.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1025 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1025.html |