IA SSB1022 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 4:00PM 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 4:00 pm Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage drink pods and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage drink pods and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 4:00PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-14SenateSubcommittee: Johnson, Boulton, and Koelker.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

HSB62 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback