IA SSB1018 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Note: Legislation has been replaced by SF130
Note: Legislation has been replaced by HF118

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2017-01-24 - Voted - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to public funding and regulatory matters and making, reducing, transferring, and supplementing appropriations for expenditures in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2016, and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to public funding and regulatory matters and making, reducing, transferring, and supplementing appropriations for expenditures in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2016, and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-24SenateVoted - Appropriations
2017-01-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 2:30PM RM 22
2017-01-20SenateAppropriations: Schneider Chair, Kraayenbrink, Bolkcom
2017-01-19SenateIn Appropriations
2017-01-19SenateRecorded

Same As/Similar To

HSB27 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Passed subcommittee.
SF130 (Replaced by) 2017-02-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 203.
HF118 (Replaced by) 2017-01-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 145.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback