IA SSB1006 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF341
Note: Legislation replaced by HF561

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the perfection of mechanics' liens and mechanics' liens remedies.(See SF 341.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the perfection of mechanics' liens and mechanics' liens remedies.(See SF 341.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 341.
2021-02-03SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-28SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 10:30AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Taylor, J.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB173 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 561.
SF341 (Replaced by) 2021-03-01 - Amendment S-3044 filed
HF561 (Replaced by) 2021-02-24 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 341. S.J. 451.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback