IA SSB1004 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF253
Note: Legislation replaced by SF343
Note: Legislation replaced by SF343
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, requiring the removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, requiring the removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Bisignano, and Zaun. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 10:00AM RM 315. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Chapman. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF253 (Replaced by) 2019-02-06 - Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 218.
SF343 (Replaced by) 2019-04-01 - Subcommittee: Klein, Jeneary and Kacena. H.J. 707.
SF343 (Replaced by) 2019-04-01 - Subcommittee: Klein, Jeneary and Kacena. H.J. 707.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1004 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1004.html |