IA SSB1003 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF202

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 2:00PM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Whiting.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HF202 (Replaced by) 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback