IA SJR6 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Giddens, and Whiting. S.J. 727.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution requesting the calling of a constitutional convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that will restore balance and integrity to our elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution requesting the calling of a constitutional convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that will restore balance and integrity to our elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Giddens, and Whiting. S.J. 727.
2019-02-19SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Lykam, and Whiting. S.J. 342.
2019-01-22SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Danielson, and Whiting. S.J. 146.
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 106.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback