IA SJR14 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 60.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 60.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to requirements for certain state tax law changes and creating a taxpayer relief fund.(Formerly SSB 1207.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to requirements for certain state tax law changes and creating a taxpayer relief fund.(Formerly SSB 1207.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 60. |
2023-12-31 | Senate | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1093. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 894. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 892. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1207 (Related) 2023-04-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 14.
HSB232 (Related) 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
HSB232 (Related) 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.